Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Salzman, Alan E, Salzman, Tiara, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Ring, Robert A, against Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Northern Light Specialty Insurance Company, represented by Corley, Kanika D, Ring, Robert A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Insurance Coverage (18) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Complaint07122022
Date: July 25, 2022Summons07252022
Date: July 25, 2022Civil_Cover_Sheet07252022
Date: July 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Case Management Conference Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
November 24, 2022 | Docket Event | 66900NOTIC004d0f | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
66900NOTICETO00c1aae Notice of Removal to Federal Court, Filed |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons_First_Amended_Complaint10172022 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | First_Amended_Complaint_Salzman_3 | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee) Summons Issued, Filed re FAC |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee) Amended Complaint, Filed - FAC |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint07122022 | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons07252022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.