Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mayer, Annisa, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Publication, Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Petition for Change of Name, Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Received Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed HRG: 10/3/2022 |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application and Order, Received Application and Order, Filed App, Decl and Proposed Order to Dispense Notice |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name, Filed for 3 minor children |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.