Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garibay Pulido, Alfredo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Liggett, Bradley D, against Medina, Megan Blair, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Pulido_A_Summons
Date: July 22, 2022Pulido_A_Civil_Case_Cover_Sheet
Date: July 22, 2022Pulido_A_Complaint
Date: July 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | 67096Reque00f4f9 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Resetting Hearing - Zoom Optional Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 266813_POS | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (North) Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.