Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dolzadelli, Shelbie Ann, filed a(n) (16) Unlimited Fraud case represented by Kolakowski, Leonard Michael, against 3Rd Generation, Inc., American Auto Inc., Super Shopper Auto Sales, Inc. 2, Western Surety Company, represented by Babbitt, Gregory Thomas, Fallat, John Lyster, Parvaneh, Ali, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
Category(16) Unlimited Fraud |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Consent To Electronic Service
Date: September 16, 2022Declaration
Date: September 16, 2022Statement
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Status of Dismissal Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to 3rd Generation, Inc Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV02113 Dolzadelli, Shelbie Ann v. Super Shopper Auto Sales, Inc. et al. EVENT: Defendants Super Shopper Auto Sales, Inc. and 3G Plus 1, Inc. dba California Auto Finance’s Notice of Motion to Compel... | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendants Super Shopper Auto Sales, Inc and 3G Plus 1, Inc's Motion to Compel Arbitration Motion hearings - Predisposition Defendant's Super Shopper Auto Sales, Inc. and 3G Plus 1, Inc dba California Auto Finance's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Defendants Super Shopper Auto Sales, Inc. and 3G Plus 1, Inc. dba California Auto Finance's Notice of Motion to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 1281.2, 1281.4, and 1281.7; to Stay the Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration; Requests for Costs in the Amount of $879.95 is unopposed and is GRANTED in its entirety. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for March 8, 2023 is continued to July 19, 2023 at 10:30am. Defendants shall prepare and submit a form of order consistent with this ruling. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Counsel's Change of Address Change of Address |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Counsel's Notice of Change of Address Change of Address |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continued Motion Hearing Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.