Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Michelle Baass, Director Of The California Department Of Health Care Services, filed a(n) (42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 case represented by Murphy, Christine Michelle, against Chera Stevens, As Trustee Of The Mark R Stevens Special Needs Trust, Patricia Ann Boone, As The Successor Trustee And Trust Administrator Of Mark R. Stevens Special Needs Trust, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
Category(42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Complaint
Date: September 14, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 14, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Patricia Ann Boone as the Successor & Trust Administrator of Mark Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Chera Stevens as Trustee of the Mark R Stevens Special Needs Trust Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order RE Erroneous Filing Order Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.