Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Taylor, Matthew John, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Singleton, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Declaration
Date: September 14, 2022Request for Order - Harassment
Date: October 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Mediated Agreement 10/03/2022; If no appearances dismiss with predujice Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Denied Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Response | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Fee Waiver - Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.