Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Case, Maria Belle, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hernandez, Heriberto, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Granted; Continued from 10/03/2022 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Keep Minor's Information Confidential
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order Amended Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Amended |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.