We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Timothy Dobbs v. Bay Investment Group, Llc

Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago

Timothy Dobbs, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Bay Investment Group, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with James R. Reilly presiding.

Case Details for Timothy Dobbs v. Bay Investment Group, Llc

Judge

James R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

April 22, 2022

Category

Unlimited Civil (Breach Of Rental/Lease Contra...)

Last Refreshed

August 30, 2023

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Parties for Timothy Dobbs v. Bay Investment Group, Llc

Plaintiffs

Timothy Dobbs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Bay Investment Group, Llc

Other Parties

Andrew Wolff (Att)

Andrew Wolff (Attorney)

Bay Investment Group, Llc (Def)

Jack Arthur Klauschie (Att)

James Reilly (Party)

Timothy Dobbs (Plain)

Case Events for Timothy Dobbs v. Bay Investment Group, Llc

Type Description
Jury Trial
Pre-Trial Conference
Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)
Docket Event Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 10/11/2022 Result Type to Held
Event
Docket Event Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Document
Docket Event Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Minute Order
Docket Event Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303
Event
Docket Event Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25
Event
Docket Event Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25
Event
Docket Event Case Management Statement Filed by: BAY INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC (Defendant)
Document
See all events