Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Timothy Dobbs, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Bay Investment Group, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Breach Of Rental/Lease Contra...) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 | Jury Trial | ||
February 16, 2024 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
January 30, 2024 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 10/11/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303 Event |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by: BAY INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC (Defendant) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.