Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Varian David, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2022 |
CategoryLimited Civil (Collections Case - Seller Pla...) |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Complaint filed by Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 02/15/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff) As to: Varian David (Defendant) Document |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Non Service Filed by: Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff) Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Non Service Filed by: Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff) Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Declaration Re: Venue Filed by: Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff) As to: Varian David (Defendant) Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) Case |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Somnath Raj Chatterjee in Department 517 Hayward Hall of Justice Assignment |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff) As to: Varian David (Defendant) Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff) As to: Varian David (Defendant) Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff) As to: Varian David (Defendant) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.