Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Babette Bach, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by William Mitchell Margolin, against Does 1 - 10 Inclusive, Michael E. Ellis, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
61445Civil01bb61
Date: August 05, 202261445Compl004e7e
Date: August 05, 202261445Summo023479
Date: August 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | 70109Reque009ca8 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Full | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CW454021 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 66735CaseM001d64 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 61445Civil01bb61 | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 61445Compl004e7e | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 61445Summo023479 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.