Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cynthia Shaw, James B. Shaw, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Walter Howard Loving, against Does 1 - 100 Inclusive, Gerald Evans Forbes, represented by Kara Lee Hitchcock, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
61408Compl0089ac
Date: August 04, 202261408Summo022c98
Date: August 04, 202261408Civil01a623
Date: August 04, 202262487Proof000b01
Date: August 25, 202263224Answe00f09f
Date: September 09, 202263224Notic01ce04
Date: September 09, 202266391CaseM003171
Date: November 15, 202266387CaseM003713
Date: November 15, 202266387NOTIC01bc14
Date: November 15, 202267415Notic00a4d1
Date: December 06, 202267951Notic00e21a
Date: December 16, 202268133CaseM002e6a
Date: December 20, 202275697CaseM0075d5
Date: May 12, 202379278CaseM00649d
Date: July 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | 79278CaseM00649d | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | 75697CaseM0075d5 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | 68133CaseM002e6a | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | 67951Notic00e21a | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Deposit | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | 67415Notic00a4d1 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Court-ordered mediation - case submission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.