Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Katherine D Corona, Raymond K. Corona, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jonathon Ross Giffen, against Does 1-10, Katharina Box Peters, Ronnie Peters, represented by Larry Joe Lichtenegger, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2022 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Corona - Civil Summons.08.03.22
Date: August 03, 2022Corona - Civil Cover Sheet.08.03.22
Date: August 03, 2022Corona - Complaint.08.03.22
Date: August 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal + POS | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Plntf Notice of CMC | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Application: Ex Parte (No Fees) | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Plntf Ex Parte Appl. for Extention to Serve Ronnie Peters | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | POS of Summons - Katherina Peters.08-14-22 | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.