Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Johnson Javier Rivas, Jonathan Rivas, Rebecca Arelly Rivas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hagop Jack Jambazian, against Does 1 - 50 Inclusive, Doroteo Resendiz Vasquez, Elizabeth Vasquez, Seven Brothers Construction Llc, Shaws Auto Sales, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Johnson Javier Rivas, Rebecca Arellly Rivas, and Jonathan Rivas against Seven Brothers Construction LLC, Shaws Auto Sales, Elizabeth Vazquez, Doroteo Resendiz Vazquez, and Does 1 through 50. The plaintiffs allege negligence...
20220802 - (RIVAS) - Civil case cover sheet.
Date: August 02, 202220220802 - (RIVAS) - Complaint - (Negligence).
Date: August 02, 202220220802 - (RIVAS) - Summons.
Date: August 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 324573.1209988.RFDFILED | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230417 - (Rivas et al.) - NOS | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 315990_1160677_20230224RivasCMCstmt1 | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 298399.1059810.20221117 - (Rivas) - Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 298399.1059863.298399.1059809.20221117 - (Rivas) - CMC 12.6.22 | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Deposit | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.