Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
David Gill, Susan Gill, Western Harvesting Transport Llc, Quince Mcallister, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Anna Joy Monteleone, Evan James Spano, against Advance Auto Parts, Carquest, David Gill, Golden State Supply Llc, Golden State Supply Llc Dba Advance Auto Parts, (total of 13) See All represented by David Schultz Rosenbaum, Miloslav Khadilkar, Patrick Mark Mahoney, Emily Diane Bergstrom, Jamie Oehrle Norman, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Quince McAllister against multiple defendants. The plaintiff alleges negligence, negligent supervision, and premises liability. The defendants include various business entities and individuals. The incident...
McAllister Q - efile Notice of Settlement
Date: April 24, 2024McAllister Q - efile Complaint
Date: August 01, 2022McAllister Q - efile Summons
Date: August 01, 2022McAllister Q - efile Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 01, 2022267273_POS
Date: August 10, 2022267274_POS
Date: August 10, 2022267271_POS
Date: August 11, 2022267270_POS
Date: August 11, 2022267275_POS
Date: August 16, 2022267279_POS
Date: August 16, 2022267277_POS
Date: August 16, 2022267278_POS
Date: August 16, 2022267276_POS
Date: August 16, 2022267272_POS
Date: August 16, 2022267280_POS
Date: August 17, 2022267749_POS
Date: August 31, 2022order
Date: September 15, 2022mtn
Date: September 15, 2022Proposed order for Motion to Intervene
Date: September 16, 2022Motion to Intervene
Date: September 16, 2022NOTICE OF REMOTE
Date: September 28, 2022All Client - Cross- Complaint - FINAL
Date: October 18, 2022All clients - Summons - FINAL
Date: October 18, 2022All Clients - Answer to Complaint - FINAL
Date: October 18, 2022All Clients - Answer to Complaint - FINAL
Date: October 19, 2022Answer - Golden State Supply
Date: October 21, 2022S. Gills - Answer to Complaint - FINAL
Date: October 21, 2022D. Gills - Answer to Complaint - FINAL
Date: October 21, 2022Western harvesting - Answer - FINAL
Date: October 21, 2022McAllister Q - efile CMS for 11.29.22 CMC
Date: November 07, 20221609 McAllister CMS 11.29.22 (POS 11.7.22)
Date: November 07, 20221609 McAllister Garcia CMS (POS 11.8.22)
Date: November 08, 2022McAllister Q - Efile Dismissal for Adv Auto Parts & GSS dba Adv Auto Parts
Date: November 14, 2022All Clients - Case Management Statement
Date: November 14, 2022McAllister Q - Efile Amended CMS for 11.29.22 CMC
Date: November 15, 2022CMC (signed) 11.16.2022
Date: November 16, 2022Def Garcia Answer to Complaint
Date: November 22, 2022McAllister_Q_Efile_Dismi_f_Rio_Farms_LLC_003_
Date: November 23, 202266900ANSWE007236
Date: November 24, 202266900DEFEN018728
Date: November 24, 202266900NOTIC03da2d
Date: November 24, 202266900DEFEN020db8
Date: November 24, 2022comp in iner
Date: November 30, 2022ntc of ruling
Date: November 30, 2022Garcia Answer to Complaint (POS 12.21.22)
Date: December 21, 202269254NOTIC000ff5
Date: January 13, 2023McAllister Q - efile Dismissal of KC Auto dba Carquest
Date: January 31, 2023McAllister Q - efile Dismissal of GSS & Carquest
Date: February 08, 2023McAllister Q - efile CMS for 03.07.23 CMC
Date: February 14, 2023All Clients - CMC FINAL
Date: February 15, 20231609 McAllister - CMS J. Garcia 3.7.23
Date: February 15, 202320230215 McAllister KC AUTO CMC Statement 3723
Date: February 15, 2023NTC of posting jury fees
Date: February 16, 2023CMS
Date: February 16, 20232023.02.17 - KC Auto ATXC
Date: February 17, 20232023.02.17 - KC Auto ATC
Date: February 17, 20231609 Garcia Answer Complaint Intervention
Date: February 21, 2023Substitution of Attorney fully executed Final
Date: February 24, 2023REQ
Date: February 25, 2023McAllister Q - efile Dismissal of John Gill
Date: February 28, 2023RFD
Date: March 02, 2023409852.1472536.Request_for_DismissalCII_w_POS
Date: May 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | McAllister Q - efile Notice of Settlement | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement Conditional All Parties | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Partial | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | 409852.1472536.Request_for_DismissalCII_w_POS | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Settlement conference - Ordered | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Partial | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | RFD | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Partial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.