Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brewer, Vivian Vernell, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Initial) Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date:12/7/22 Time:9am Department:303 cc box 1 |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship cc mailed |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Initial) Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeared in Person | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigation Report Fee waived |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of C.I. report |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Due Diligence as to: Francisco Hernandez (Paternal Grandfather) cc box 1 |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Due Diligence as to: Donald Walker (Maternal Grandfather) cc box 1 |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document filed Document: Correction of Clerical Error cc in box 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.