Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alcantar, Irene, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2022 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the First Account or Petition for Final Distribution
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition - Probate Petition for Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Probate cc emailed Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letters (Estates) cc emailed |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Errata |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Declaration of Publication |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Date: 07/19/2022 Time:9am Dept: 303 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.