Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dorman, Mark Ian, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2022 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition - Probate Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary and for Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Declaration of Publication |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Date: 7/13/2022 Time: 9:00am Dept:303 |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities (Estates) | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Probate (Initial) Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary and for Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.