Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Castaneda, Juana H., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2022 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Probate Status Hearing RE: Temporary Appointment of the Public Guardian of the Estate Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship Extended cc emailed |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Maria Sanchez, Spanish Interpreter |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Probate Status Hearing RE: Temporary Appointment of the Public Guardian of the Estate Judge: Cardoza, Jane |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeared in Person | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Temporary Appointment of the Public Guardian of the Estate
Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Appearance. Notice of Remote Appearance |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Duties of Conservator |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.