We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Christina Roberts Mckeever

Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago

Mckeever, Edward, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Mckeever, Edward, against Mckeever, Christina Roberts, represented by Mckeever, Christina Roberts, in the jurisdiction of Caddo Parish, LA, . Caddo Parish, LA Superior Courts District with Judge:Section D presiding.

Case Details for Mckeever, Edward v. Mckeever, Christina Roberts

Judge

Judge:Section D

Filing Date

June 28, 2024

Category

Civil

Last Refreshed

June 30, 2024

Filing Location

Caddo Parish, LA

Filing Court House

District

Parties for Mckeever, Edward v. Mckeever, Christina Roberts

Plaintiffs

Mckeever, Edward

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Mckeever, Edward

Defendants

Mckeever, Christina Roberts

Attorneys for Defendants

Mckeever, Christina Roberts

Case Events for Mckeever, Edward v. Mckeever, Christina Roberts

Type Description
Docket Event JUD EXP FUND (RS 13:996.16)
Docket Event COURT REPORTER (ACT 13 - 2015)
Docket Event JUDGES COMP (ACT 63-1985)
Docket Event ADVANCE DEPOSITS - GIPSON LAW OFFICE
See all events

Related Content in Caddo Parish

Case

NEOMA ELIZABETH MCGEE
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651469

Case

KIMMBLE WEAVER
Jul 10, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651479

Case

GHALI E GHALI
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651457

Case

LATISHA PATRICE BOWIE
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651397

Case

LAURA BOOGAERTS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651401

Case

HAZEL STEWART GRAY CALVET
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651443

Case

LOUELLA JACKSON JOHNSON
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651451

Case

MELISSA F THOMAS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section D | Civil | Civil | 651400

Case

LOUISE WILLIAMS WHITE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651433

Case

THOMAS DONOHUE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651415

Case

LAYLA BROWN
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section D | Civil | Civil | 651425

Case

CHARLES R FESTERVAND
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651449

Case

GLORIA DARLENE CONRAD
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651468

Case

LOU ELLEN GUESS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651393

Case

JAMES HEATH, ET AL
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651456

Case

JIMMY R GLAZE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651419

Case

CORWIN BROSSETT
Jul 10, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651478

Case

WALTER MCCURRY
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651422

Case

VERA WESLEY
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651437

Case

SONJA NORMAN ET AL
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651439

Case

MARY ELIZABETH PACE
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651403

Case

GERALD BURROUGHS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section F | Civil | Civil | 651394

Case

JEFFERY SUMMAGE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section F | Civil | Civil | 651426

Case

MICHAEL MINOR
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section D | Civil | Civil | 651461

Case

DANA J ELLIOTT
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651418