We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Adwenar Lee

Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago

Lee, Brandon, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Lee, Brandon, against Lee, Adwenar, represented by Lee, Adwenar, in the jurisdiction of Caddo Parish, LA, . Caddo Parish, LA Superior Courts District with Judge:Section F presiding.

Case Details for Lee, Brandon v. Lee, Adwenar

Judge

Judge:Section F

Filing Date

June 24, 2024

Category

Civil

Last Refreshed

June 25, 2024

Filing Location

Caddo Parish, LA

Filing Court House

District

Parties for Lee, Brandon v. Lee, Adwenar

Plaintiffs

Lee, Brandon

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Lee, Brandon

Defendants

Lee, Adwenar

Attorneys for Defendants

Lee, Adwenar

Case Events for Lee, Brandon v. Lee, Adwenar

Type Description
Docket Event JUD EXP FUND (RS 13:996.16)
Docket Event JUDGES COMP (ACT 63-1985)
Docket Event COURT REPORTER (ACT 13 - 2015)
Docket Event ADVANCE DEPOSITS - BRANDON LEE
See all events

Related Content in Caddo Parish

Case

EDWIN EUGENE RUSHING
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651432

Case

BARTHOLOMEW EVANS, ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651492

Case

RODNEY S HUFF
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651541

Case

CARL DOUGLAS ADAMS
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651525

Case

NARITA LOYD GOFF AKA ET AL
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651420

Case

NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC ET AL
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651458

Case

MARY SEGURA ET AL
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651444

Case

AARON KENNEDY JR, ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651524

Case

BETTY JEAN BARNES TREECE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651430

Case

RABUTH CRAWFORD NUNN
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651557

Case

DONALD HOPKINS
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651452

Case

ROBERT R JOHNSON SR
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651552

Case

RENE RASCO
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651454

Case

KING J SNEED
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651490

Case

JACOB SEVIN
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651465

Case

CHARLES LEE CANADA
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651544

Case

NEOMA ELIZABETH MCGEE
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651469

Case

CORRENA J FAAS
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651435

Case

TAQUESHA LAQUAN LANDERS AKA ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651527

Case

DANA J ELLIOTT
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651418

Case

MAXINE WARREN
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651555

Case

ROBERT BERTRAND
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651447

Case

BRYAN L SWISHER
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651455

Case

LOUELLA JACKSON JOHNSON
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651451

Case

ESTATE OF EUGENIE LUCY ABRAMSON BRAINIS ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651495