We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago

Johnson, William, Jr, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Johnson, William, Jr, against Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance, Beasley, Damien Ramal, represented by Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance, Beasley, Damien Ramal, in the jurisdiction of Caddo Parish, LA, . Caddo Parish, LA Superior Courts District with Judge:Section A presiding.

Case Details for Johnson, William, Jr v. Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company , et al.

Judge

Judge:Section A

Filing Date

June 11, 2024

Category

Civil

Last Refreshed

June 12, 2024

Filing Location

Caddo Parish, LA

Filing Court House

District

Parties for Johnson, William, Jr v. Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company , et al.

Plaintiffs

Johnson, William, Jr

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Johnson, William, Jr

Defendants

Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance

Beasley, Damien Ramal

Attorneys for Defendants

Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance

Beasley, Damien Ramal

Case Events for Johnson, William, Jr v. Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company , et al.

Type Description
See all events

Related Content in Caddo Parish

Case

NEOMA ELIZABETH MCGEE
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651469

Case

KIMMBLE WEAVER
Jul 10, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651479

Case

GHALI E GHALI
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651457

Case

LATISHA PATRICE BOWIE
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651397

Case

LAURA BOOGAERTS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651401

Case

HAZEL STEWART GRAY CALVET
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651443

Case

LOUELLA JACKSON JOHNSON
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651451

Case

MELISSA F THOMAS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section D | Civil | Civil | 651400

Case

LOUISE WILLIAMS WHITE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651433

Case

THOMAS DONOHUE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651415

Case

LAYLA BROWN
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section D | Civil | Civil | 651425

Case

CHARLES R FESTERVAND
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651449

Case

GLORIA DARLENE CONRAD
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651468

Case

LOU ELLEN GUESS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651393

Case

JAMES HEATH, ET AL
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651456

Case

JIMMY R GLAZE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651419

Case

CORWIN BROSSETT
Jul 10, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651478

Case

WALTER MCCURRY
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651422

Case

VERA WESLEY
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651437

Case

SONJA NORMAN ET AL
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651439

Case

MARY ELIZABETH PACE
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651403

Case

GERALD BURROUGHS
Jul 03, 2024 | Judge:Section F | Civil | Civil | 651394

Case

JEFFERY SUMMAGE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section F | Civil | Civil | 651426

Case

MICHAEL MINOR
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section D | Civil | Civil | 651461

Case

DANA J ELLIOTT
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651418