We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Christopher B. Washington

Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago

Transport Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Transport Funding Llc, against Washington, Christopher B, represented by Washington, Christopher B, in the jurisdiction of Caddo Parish, LA, . Caddo Parish, LA Superior Courts with Judge:Section B presiding.

Case Details for Transport Funding Llc v. Washington, Christopher B

Judge

Judge:Section B

Filing Date

February 28, 2024

Category

Civil

Last Refreshed

March 01, 2024

Filing Location

Caddo Parish, LA

Parties for Transport Funding Llc v. Washington, Christopher B

Plaintiffs

Transport Funding Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Transport Funding Llc

Defendants

Washington, Christopher B

Attorneys for Defendants

Washington, Christopher B

Case Events for Transport Funding Llc v. Washington, Christopher B

Type Description
See all events

Related Content in Caddo Parish

Case

EDWIN EUGENE RUSHING
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651432

Case

BARTHOLOMEW EVANS, ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651492

Case

RODNEY S HUFF
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651541

Case

CARL DOUGLAS ADAMS
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651525

Case

NARITA LOYD GOFF AKA ET AL
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651420

Case

NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC ET AL
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651458

Case

MARY SEGURA ET AL
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651444

Case

AARON KENNEDY JR, ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651524

Case

BETTY JEAN BARNES TREECE
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651430

Case

RABUTH CRAWFORD NUNN
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651557

Case

DONALD HOPKINS
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651452

Case

ROBERT R JOHNSON SR
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651552

Case

RENE RASCO
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651454

Case

KING J SNEED
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651490

Case

JACOB SEVIN
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651465

Case

CHARLES LEE CANADA
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651544

Case

NEOMA ELIZABETH MCGEE
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651469

Case

CORRENA J FAAS
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651435

Case

TAQUESHA LAQUAN LANDERS AKA ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651527

Case

DANA J ELLIOTT
Jul 08, 2024 | Judge:Section C | Civil | Civil | 651418

Case

MAXINE WARREN
Jul 12, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651555

Case

ROBERT BERTRAND
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651447

Case

BRYAN L SWISHER
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section E | Civil | Civil | 651455

Case

LOUELLA JACKSON JOHNSON
Jul 09, 2024 | Judge:Section B | Civil | Civil | 651451

Case

ESTATE OF EUGENIE LUCY ABRAMSON BRAINIS ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 | Judge:Section A | Civil | Civil | 651495