Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Giraudo, Louis, Pesco, Nicole Piccinini, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Consolidated | |
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Objection | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case | |
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Estates/Trusts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.