Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilson, Austin, Badillo, Paula, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryCompromise Of Disputed Claim |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.