Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpeiller, Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Review Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Status Report: 12200
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Estates/Trusts | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | First and Final Accounting: Petition | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Status Report: 12200
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Review Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Report - PrC 12200 | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Estates/Trusts | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.