Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Steely, Janice, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Estate Of John D. Steely, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing - Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Spousal Property Order | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition - No Fee | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.