Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Estremos Karen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Estremos Richie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Sarah J. Heidel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah J. Heidel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | ||
January 19, 2023 | Proof of Service - Mail | ||
December 19, 2022 | DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 (FL case) | ||
November 29, 2022 | Notice - Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action (Withdrawal of Lis Pendens) | ||
November 18, 2022 | Judgment | ||
November 18, 2022 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
November 16, 2022 | Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated | ||
November 16, 2022 | Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry | ||
November 15, 2022 | Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense | ||
November 15, 2022 | Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.