Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ramsey Patricia A., Ramsey Patricia A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cawelti Stephen Lloyd, Calwelti Stephen K, against Ramsey Joe D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Sarah J. Heidel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah J. Heidel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Department E at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Conference |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department K, Heidel, Sarah J., Presiding RFOMOD - Spousal Support - Held - Order Made RFOMOD - Spousal Support - Held - Order Made Judge: Heidel Sarah J. |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration (Declarations) ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations) ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RFO/MTN - Mod - Spousal Support (Set date for respondent to retrieve belongings pursuant to Order filed ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.