Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Sheinbaum, Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSheinbaum, Jordan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial - Short Cause
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Trial | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial Party: Petitioner Gonzalez, Maria Trinidad |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Granted Party: Respondent Espinoza, Javier |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Requested Party: Respondent Espinoza, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.