Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hart, Linda, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Hart, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Elder Or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order-Elder Abuse/Dependent Adult
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order-Elder Abuse/Dependent Adult
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.