We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Sandra Lopez v. Hector Hugo Ramos-Cardenas , et al.

Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago

Sandra Lopez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Hector Hugo Ramos-Cardenas, Irma Susana Pena, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey S. Brand presiding.

Case Details for Sandra Lopez v. Hector Hugo Ramos-Cardenas , et al.

Judge

Jeffrey S. Brand Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

December 01, 2021

Category

Unlimited Civil (Personal Injury/Property Dama...)

Last Refreshed

September 06, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Matter Type

General Torts

Filing Court House

Superior

Parties for Sandra Lopez v. Hector Hugo Ramos-Cardenas , et al.

Plaintiffs

Sandra Lopez

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Hector Hugo Ramos-Cardenas

Irma Susana Pena

Other Parties

Elika Morris (Att)

Elika Morris (Attorney)

H. Nathan James (Att)

H. Nathan James (Attorney)

Jeffrey Brand (Party)

Case Events for Sandra Lopez v. Hector Hugo Ramos-Cardenas , et al.

Type Description
Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)
Jury Trial
Case Management Conference
Docket Event Tentative Ruling Published for 05/24/2023 3:00 PM Case Management Conference}
Tentative Ruling
Docket Event Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Sandra Lopez (Plaintiff) As to: Hector Hugo Ramos-Cardenas (Defendant); Irma Susana Pena (Defendant)
Document
Docket Event Case Management Statement Filed by: Sandra Lopez (Plaintiff)
Document
Docket Event Reset - Court Unavailable, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/24/2023 03:00 PM
Event
Docket Event Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Document
Docket Event Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 22
Event
Docket Event Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 22 updated: Result Date to 07/20/2022 Result Type to Held
Event
See all events