Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Steven K. Slocum presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven K. Slocum Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
|
Arraignment: Complaint
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Bond Forfeiture
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
CR Criminal Courtesy Notice Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Police Report/Incident Report | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Booking Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.