We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

People Of The State Of California, Plaintiff(S) Vs. Jose Manuel Hernandez, Jr, Defendant(S)

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Rosenthal, Sara R, against Hernandez, Jose Manuel, Junior, represented by Andrade, Vincent, Loethen, Christopher Paul, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Slocum, Steven presiding.

Case Details

Judge

Slocum, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

May 27, 2021

Category

Felony

Last Refreshed

November 16, 2021

Practice Area

Criminal

Filing Location

Merced County, CA

Matter Type

General Criminal

Matter Type

Plea

Case Documents

Further Proceedings

Date: October 04, 2021

Preliminary Examination

Date: November 15, 2021

Doctor Report: PC1368

Date: August 10, 2021

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Preliminary Examination

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Preliminary Examination

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Doctor Report: PC1368

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Further Proceedings

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Evaluation Request
Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Further Proceedings

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event PC1370 Commitment Order

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Doctor Report: PC1368

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Doctor Report: PC1368

Judge: Slocum, Steven

See all events