We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

People Of The State Of California, Plaintiff(S) Vs. Jose Perez-Rivera, Defendant(S)

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Her, Lee, Silveira, Nicole A., against Perez-Rivera, Jose Guadalupe, represented by Galeon, Erica Joy, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Slocum, Steven presiding.

Case Details

Judge

Slocum, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

May 26, 2021

Category

Misdemeanor

Last Refreshed

August 26, 2021

Practice Area

Criminal

Filing Location

Merced County, CA

Matter Type

General Criminal

Matter Type

Plea

Case Documents

Pre-Trial Conference

Date: August 25, 2021

Pre-Trial Conference

Date: August 18, 2021

Pre-Trial Conference

Date: August 09, 2021

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Pre-Trial Conference

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Pre-Trial Conference

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Pre-Trial Conference

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Pre-Trial Conference

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Pre-Trial Conference

Judge: Hashimoto, Roy

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Motion

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Motion
Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Pre-Trial Conference

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Warrant: Issued
Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Arraignment: Complaint

Judge: Slocum, Steven

See all events