We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

People Of The State Of California, Plaintiff(S) Vs. Timothy Richard Howeth, Defendant(S)

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Egan, Gerad Denis, against Howeth, Timothy Richard, represented by Coughlin, Michael, Galeon, Erica Joy, Sok, Curtis B, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Slocum, Steven presiding.

Case Details

Judge

Slocum, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

May 18, 2021

Category

Felony

Last Refreshed

November 13, 2021

Practice Area

Criminal

Filing Location

Merced County, CA

Matter Type

General Criminal

Matter Type

Plea

Case Documents

Further Proceedings

Date: November 12, 2021

Further Proceedings

Date: October 21, 2021

Further Proceedings

Date: October 14, 2021

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Further Proceedings

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Further Proceedings

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Further Proceedings

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Notice

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Further Proceedings

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Further Proceedings

Judge: Kirihara, John

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Arraignment: Warrant - Video

Judge: Lo, Paul

Docket Event Criminal: Minute Order
Program Status

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Probation is revoked

Judge: Slocum, Steven

Docket Event Warrant: Issued
See all events