Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gudgel, Richard, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Potter, Dirk Deverne, against Frank Walker Dba Pro-2-Pro, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
Category(31) Limited Commercial Unlawful Detainer - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Request or Counter Request to Set Case for Trial
Date: March 30, 2021Court Trial
Date: April 16, 2021Answer - Response - Denial - Limited $10K to $25K
Date: March 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Answer Court Trial Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet for Declaration of Covid-19 Related Financial Distress Review Hearing Covid-19 Related Financial Distress Hearing Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Set Case for Trial Request or Counter Request to Set Case for Trial |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Frank Walker dba Pro-2-Pro, LLC Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Trial | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Answer Answer - Response - Denial - Limited $10K to $25K |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet for Declaration of Covid-19 Related Financial Distress Financial Declaration |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.