Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Merida Beverly, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Deloya Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Restraining Order Hearing |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (dv-120 served 09/24/2021 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion Filed by Respondent |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Domestic Violence Filed by Respondent |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Form EPO-001 Emergency Protective Orders | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.