Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Egan Brian, Henry Donavan, Henry Donavon, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Barnett Leslie Ann, Muscarella Frederick Gerard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gus T. May presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGus T. May Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Motion Hearing |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service via Mail of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Comment) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Attorney |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Declarations) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Accounting (Order Settling First and Final Account and Report of Temporary Conservator ) Filed by Conservator |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: May Gus T. |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Conservator |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.