Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Los Angeles Office Of The Public Guardian, Movsesian Shoushan, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Sirkin Mina Nosrati, Smith Leslie Renee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jonathan L. Rosenbloom presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJonathan L. Rosenbloom Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2025 | Hearing |
Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
November 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
October 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Petition Hearing |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Subject |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Report ) Filed by Subject |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplement (Supplement To the Petition for Substituted Judgment ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination (Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (10/20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship (Letters - Conservatorship (GC-350) (Conservatorship) ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.