Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Thornton Tina, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Brenda Penny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrenda Penny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Matcham, Susan J., Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Matcham Susan J. |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 18, 2021 | Hearing | ||
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held Judge: Penny Brenda J. |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Report - DCFS (Search Results ) | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Report - DCFS (Search Results ) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian (Person Only ) Filed by Minor |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters - Temporary Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.