Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Giron Richard, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Lee Joseph Hyunsung, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lee R. Bogdanoff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee R. Bogdanoff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial) filed on June 29, 2021 by Richard Giron. ) | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial) filed on June 29, 2021 by Richard Giron. ) | |
November 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Appointment Hearing - Conservator |
|
November 16, 2021 | Hearing | ||
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temp Conservatorship - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.