Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Merlo Claudine, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Deborah L. Christian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah L. Christian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Accounting Hearing |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplement (Second Supplement to Combined First and Final Account ) Filed by Conservator |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by Conservator |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal Corrected ) Filed by Conservator |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Conservator |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ) Filed by Conservator |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Conservator |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notification - Cons/Guard Address (Notification - Cons/Guard Address ) Filed by Conservator |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.