Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Adamic David Duane, Adamic Kelly, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Brandlin Christopher Paul, Perryman Mark Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Susan J. Matcham presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan J. Matcham Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling at OSC ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CAC Appointment Ordered | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Garcia Ruben |
|
October 06, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Death (Notice of Death of Conservatee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation (File only per PA. ) Filed by Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.