Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dean Diana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramon Pompilio Jimenez, Ramon Pompilion Jimenez, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Amy M. Pellman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy M. Pellman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 2A, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Pellman Amy M. |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC ) | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC ) | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (POS not valid ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (POS not valid ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (Defective- Incomplete ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property (**Item #9 Not Listed In Petition ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.