Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aviles De Paz Wilfredo, Gonzalez Esmeralda Ivette, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Thomas Rikisha D., against Tovar Jose Santiago, represented by Simons Steven Ames, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Jose Santiago Tovar (Defendant); As to: Esmeralda Ivette Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jose Santiago Tovar (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jose Santiago Tovar (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice Tovar-Notice of OSC Contempt RE Sanctions; Filed by: Jose Santiago Tovar (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for King)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Princess)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.