Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Haney Lisa S, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Espinoza Keli J, Tene Eli Dba Peak Foreclosure Services Inc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryIntentional Infliction Of Emotional Distress (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Lisa S Haney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application writ of mandate; Filed by: Lisa S Haney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lisa S Haney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lisa S Haney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Lisa S Haney (Plaintiff); As to: Keli J Espinoza (Defendant); Eli Tene (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (writ of mandate)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Failure to Appear))
Date: March 09, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (writ of mandate)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/06/2022)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.