Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
1250916 Ontario Ltd., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Dorenfeld David K., Mazarei Mazyar Hassan, against Kagan Safaa Idyouss, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SAFAA IDYOUSS KAGAN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER FAILURE TO APPEAR)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND FA...)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve and Fa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal after failure to appear)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/27/2022)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.