Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ghaed Javad, Ghaed Ladan, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Adams Thomas Gregory, against Jiles Staysia, Jones Daniel L., Jones Norris Holdings Inc. Dba Health Coverage Fast, represented by Lorch Gary Jay, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRupert A. Byrdsong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Professional Malpractice (Not Medical Or Legal) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.