Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Karasseva Larissa, Shirazi Alireza, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Turner Keith J., against Akesson Linda, Mccartney Ashley, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Agness Aaron Chapman, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 02, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2021Complaint
Date: July 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Notice of Remand) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Final Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by ALIREZA SHIRAZI (Plaintiff); LARISSA KARASSEVA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Remand)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Remand) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , Final Trial Preparation) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by ALIREZA SHIRAZI (Plaintiff)
Date: May 12, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by ALIREZA SHIRAZI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by ALIREZA SHIRAZI (Plaintiff); LARISSA KARASSEVA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Filing Proof of Service) Filed by ALIREZA SHIRAZI (Plaintiff); LARISSA KARASSEVA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by ALIREZA SHIRAZI (Plaintiff); LARISSA KARASSEVA (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.